Del Real, LLC v. Harris et al

Plaintiff: Del Real, LLC
Defendant: Kamala D. Harris, Edmund G. Brown and State of California
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01669
Filed: October 11, 2012
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER re Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/20/2012. (Martinez, A)
February 11, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS 11 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 11, 2013. Motion Hearing currently set for 2/14/2013 is VACATED. (Munoz, I)
April 3, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on April 3, 2013. Motion Hearing currently set for 4/17/2013 is VACATED. (Munoz, I)
August 19, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER re Cross Motions for Summary Judgment (Docs 26 & 37 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/19/2013. (Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Del Real, LLC v. Harris et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Del Real, LLC
Represented By: Darren P. Trone
Represented By: Kent Jeffrey Schmidt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala D. Harris
Represented By: Alexandra Robert Gordon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown
Represented By: Alexandra Robert Gordon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: Alexandra Robert Gordon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]