Fresno Unified School District v. K.U., et al.

Counter_claimant: K. U. and A. D.U.
Counter_defendant: Fresno Unified School District
Defendant: K. U. and A. D.U.
Plaintiff: Fresno Unified School District
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01699
Filed: October 15, 2012
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Michael J. Seng
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401 Education: Handicapped Child Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2013 100 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION DESIGNATING AND LODGING ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 09/25/2013. (Yu, L)
October 28, 2013 104 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Denying Counter Claimants' Motion to Amend Counter Claim (ECF 85 and 86 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/28/2013. (Yu, L)
November 6, 2013 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SHORTENING TIME. An Opposition to said Motion, if any, shall be filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants, by Monday, November 18, 2013. In the event said Motion is opposed, a Reply, if any, shall be filed by the District by Friday, November 22, 2013. The Motion shall be heard on Wednesday, November 27, 2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/6/2013. (Yu, L)
November 6, 2013 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR ORDER TO SEAL DOCUMENTS, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/06/2013. (Yu, L)
November 13, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/10/2012. (Yu, L)
January 30, 2014 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENTS and Order Requesting Clerk of Court to Place Notice and Request to Seal on Electronic Docket. Response by Plaintiff Due Within Twenty (20) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/29/2014. (Yu, L)
February 27, 2014 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 150 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion and for Hearing. A Motion Hearing is now set for March 28, at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 02/27/2014. (Yu, L)
April 28, 2014 166 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/24/2014. (Jessen, A)
February 1, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES REGARDING EXTENDING TIME TO MAKE RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND ORDER THEREON; signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/1/2013. (Yu, L)
March 25, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENT(S) signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 03/25/2013. (Yu, L)
April 16, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES REGARDING EXTENDING TIME TO LODGE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD AND ANY SUPPLEMENT THERETO AND ORDER THEREON signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 04/15/2013. (Yu, L)
May 21, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulated Request of The Parties To Extend The Time To Lodge Administrative Record And Any Supplement Thereto and Order Thereon, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 05/21/2013. (Yu, L)
June 25, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENT(S) signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 06/25/2013. (Yu, L)
July 8, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO SEAL DOCUMENTS. Plaintiff District shall forthwith serve a copy of this Order on all other Parties hereto. , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 07/08/2013. (Yu, L)
August 2, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ; GRANTING 75 Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time and GRANTING 77 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 08/02/2013. (Yu, L)
August 2, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Shortening Time to Hear Motion to Modify January 2013 Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 08/02/2013. (Yu, L)
September 13, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulation of the Parties Regarding Continuance of Hearing on Motion for Order Granting Leave to File Amended and Supplemental Counterclaims and Order Thereon, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 09/12/2013. (Yu, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fresno Unified School District v. K.U., et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: K. U.
Represented By: F. Richard Ruderman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: A. D.U.
Represented By: F. Richard Ruderman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Fresno Unified School District
Represented By: Sang Jin Nam, male
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. U.
Represented By: F. Richard Ruderman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. D.U.
Represented By: F. Richard Ruderman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fresno Unified School District
Represented By: Sang Jin Nam, male
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]