Organic Pastures Dairy Company, LLC v. Sebelius et al

Plaintiff: Organic Pastures Dairy Company, LLC
Defendant: United States Food and Drug Administration, Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Health and Human Services and Margaret A. Hamburg
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv02019
Filed: December 12, 2012
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Stanley A Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
 
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to continue scheduling conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 3/8/2013. (Initial Scheduling Conference previously set for 3/14/2013 has been CONTINUED to 4/16/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone) (Figueroa, O)
April 17, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ASSIGNING CASE RE Presiding Judge; New case number is: 1:12-cv-2019 SAB, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 04/17/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 10, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTIONS 29 36 38 and Order Setting Further Scheduling Conference. Based upon the foregoing, it is HEREBY ORDERED that: The hearing on this matter scheduled for May 15, 2013 is VACATED and taken off calendar. The parties shall not appea r at that time; Plaintiffs motion to amend is GRANTED (ECF No. 38); Plaintiff is directed to file a copy of its Second Amended Complaint within seven (7) days; Plaintiffs motion to strike and Defendants motion for judgment on the pleadings are DENIED as moot; The parties shall appear for a further scheduling conference on June 18, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. before United States Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone, in Courtroom 9 at the United States Courthouse, 2500 Tulare Street, Fresno, CA 93721; and the parties shall file a joint scheduling report by 6/11/2013. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 5/10/2013. (Hernandez, M)
August 29, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record (Doc. 57 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/29/2013. (Arellano, S.)
September 5, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/5/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Organic Pastures Dairy Company, LLC v. Sebelius et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Organic Pastures Dairy Company, LLC
Represented By: David G. Cox, PHV
Represented By: Stephanie Mejia Rocha
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Food and Drug Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Sebelius
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret A. Hamburg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]