UPF Corporation v. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.

Plaintiff: UPF Corporation
Defendant: Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00037
Filed: January 9, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Michael J. Seng
 
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Interstate Commerce Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/29/2013 re Joint Consent to Jurisdiction of U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned for all purposes to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Lundstrom, T)
November 21, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER re Continuance of Hearing on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/21/2013. Hearing on motions continued to 12/11/2013 at 09:30 AM at the United States Courthouse, 510 19th Street (JLT), Bakersfield, before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
December 12, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 17 ; ORDER DENYING Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 18 ; ORDER GRANTING the Stipulation to Extend the Discovery Deadline 25 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/12/2013. (Hall, S)
February 5, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Joint Motion for Voluntary DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/5/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Hall, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: UPF Corporation v. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPF Corporation
Represented By: Rocky K. Copley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]