Blackburn v. Sturgeon Services International, Inc. et al

Defendant: Does 1-100, Sturgeon Services International, Inc. and Adriann Rosales
Plaintiff: Anthony Blackburn
Case Number: 1:2013cv00054
Filed: January 11, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Referring Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET DEADLINE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT (Doc. 11) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on April 4, 2013. (Munoz, I)
April 16, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER To Vacate Hearing And To Term Motion (Doc. 6 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/16/2013. (Fahrney, E)
September 17, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order re 31 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/17/2013. Settlement Conference CONTINUED to 10/30/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Hall, S)
October 2, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/2/2013. Motion for Summary Adjudication Filing Deadline 11/15/2013; Opposition Filed By 12/6/2013; Reply Filed by 12/20/2013. All other dates, including the Settlement Conference currently set on 10/30/2013 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe, are VACATED. (Hall, S)
January 21, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 36 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/21/2014. (Hall, S)
March 27, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 36 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/27/2014. (Hall, S)
March 27, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 43 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/27/2014. (Hall, S)
July 11, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFTER 52 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/11/2014. (Hall, S)
August 4, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING the Action with Prejudice and DIRECTING the Clerk to Close the Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/4/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Hall, S)
March 25, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/25/2013 to address whether an amended complaint will be filed and assignment to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for all purposes re 6 . (Filing Deadline: 4/3/2013). (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackburn v. Sturgeon Services International, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sturgeon Services International, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adriann Rosales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Blackburn
Represented By: Sarah Beth Schlehr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]