Pacifica Park Apartments, LLC v. U.S. Bank National Association

Trustee: Office of the US Trustee(FRS)
Appellee: U.S. Bank National Association
Appellant: Pacifica Park Apartments, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv00164
Filed: February 4, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/28/2013 extending time to file appellant's opening brief. (Filing Deadline: 5/6/2013).(Lundstrom, T)
May 7, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER for an Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/7/13: Appellant's Opening Brief is now due on May 13, 2013. (Hellings, J)
June 25, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Appellant an Extension of Time until July 15 to file a reply brief. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/24/13. (Nazaroff, H)
September 23, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: Appeal, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/20/2013. The Appeal of the Bankruptcy Court's decision is DISMISSED. CASE CLOSED.(Fahrney, E)
March 1, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Motion for Stay, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/1/13. (Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacifica Park Apartments, LLC v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the US Trustee(FRS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Goodfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Pacifica Park Apartments, LLC
Represented By: Marcus A. Torigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.