Arredondo v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Margaret Torres Arredondo
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2013cv00300
Filed: March 1, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING Agency's Denial of Benefits and ORDERING Judgment for Commissioner signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/28/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
March 11, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 3/8/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
March 13, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Issue Summons, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 3/12/13. (Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arredondo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Torres Arredondo
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]