Burton v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC

Plaintiff: Dennis Burton
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv00307
Filed: March 4, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Referring Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO VACATE HEARING signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 16, 2013. (Munoz, I)
May 29, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Defendant's 8 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/28/13. Amended Complaint due by 6/17/2013. (Gonzalez, R)
September 3, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S F.R.Civ.P.12(f) Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses [Doc. 24] signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on September 3, 2013. Motion Hearing currently set for 9/5/2013 is VACATED. (Munoz, I)
September 27, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/27/2013. (Martinez, A)
December 23, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint re 35 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/23/2013. (Hall, S)
February 10, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time to File Class Certification Motion 48 ; SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/10/2014. Consent/Decline Deadline: 2/20/2014. Class Discovery Deadlines: Non Expert 9/19/20 14; Expert 12/1/2014. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 7/11/2014 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Class Certification Motion Deadlines: Filed by 7/28/2014; Opposition by 8/25/2014; Reply by 9/8/2014; Hearing 10/6/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Hall, S)
February 26, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court FIRST AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/26/2014. (Hall, S)
July 9, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENT, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/9/2014. (The excerpts from the transcript of the deposition of Clay Kellett, attached as Exhibit A to Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Request for Reconsid eration by the District Court of Magistrate Judges Ruling, shall be filed under seal. The excerpts from the transcript of the deposition of Clay Kellett, attached as Exhibit A to Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Request for Reconsideration by the District Court of Magistrate Judges Ruling, shall remain under seal until August 3, 2014.)(Gaumnitz, R)
August 4, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 61 Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/4/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
August 26, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 73 Without Prejudice Defendant's Request to Seal Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/26/2014. (Hall, S)
September 4, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 75 Joint Request to Seal Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/4/2014. (Hall, S)
September 10, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 79 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Oversized Reply Brief, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/10/2014. (Hall, S)
September 17, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 82 Defendant Leave to File a Sur-Reply, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/17/2014. (Hall, S)
October 8, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification re 69 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/8/2014. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Hall, S)
October 31, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 86 Findings and Recommendations Denying Plaintiff's 69 Motion for Class Certification, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/30/14. (Gonzalez, R)
November 6, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING Further Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/6/2014. Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2014 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Appearances via CourtCall are authorized. (Hall, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Burton
Represented By: Sean Patrick Reis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Erik Wayne Kemp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]