Mildebrandt-Anderson v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Tracy A Mildebrandt-Anderson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00315
Filed: March 5, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
 
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant FILE a RESPONSIVE BRIEF or a STATUS REPORT. No later than November 15, 2013, Defendant shall either file a responsive brief or file a status report indicating why no brief was filed and whether additional time beyond November 15, 2013, is necessary to file a responsive brief. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/12/2013. (Timken, A)
November 14, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Defendant's request for an extension of time. Defendant shall file a brief in response to Plaintiff's opening brief on or before December 16, 2013; and Plaintiff may file a reply brief no later than December 31, 2013. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/13/2013. (Timken, A)
December 18, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulation to Voluntary Remand Pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and to Entry of Judgment; ORDER Thereon, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/17/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
March 7, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AWARDING EAJA FEES. Plaintiff is awarded attorneys fees pursuant to the EAJA in the amount of FOUR THOUSAND DOLLARS and 00/100s ($4,000.00) and costs in the amount of THREE HUNDRED FIFTY dollars ($350.00), as authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d); and payment of EAJA fees in this matter is subject to the terms and conditions of the parties' stipulation filed at document 18 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/7/2014. (Timken, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mildebrandt-Anderson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy A Mildebrandt-Anderson
Represented By: Manuel Deeter Serpa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Theophous H. Reagans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]