United States of America v. Approximately 335 Counterfeit NFL Jerseys

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately 335 Counterfeit NFL Jerseys
Case Number: 1:2013cv00341
Filed: March 8, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 49:781 Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 13 Motion for Default Judgment Without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/24/2014. (Martinez, A)
June 9, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending the Grant of Plaintiff's 22 Ex Parte Motion for Default Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/9/2014. Objections due within fifteen (15) days of service.(Martinez, A)
July 11, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court Default Judgment and Final Judgment of Forfeiture, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 07/11/14. (Gonzalez, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately 335 Counterfeit NFL Jerseys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Heather Mardel Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 335 Counterfeit NFL Jerseys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]