Fisher v. Federal Bureau of Investigation

Plaintiff: Gary Francis Fisher
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00414
Filed: March 7, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: Stanley A Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
 
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 14 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 6/17/2013. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Motion). (Jessen, A)
June 17, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Doc. 13 ) be Dismissed Without Leave to Amend, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 6/17/2013. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
March 22, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING CLERKS OFFICE TO RE-DESIGNATE ACTION FROM 550 (CONDITIONS OF CONFINEMENT) TO 895 (FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT) AND VACATING FIRST INFORMATIONAL ORDER re 1 , 2 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/22/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
April 9, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND and REQUIRING Plaintiff to pay filing fee or to file an IFP Application signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 4/8/2013. (Amended Complaint and Motion for IFP due by 5/13/2013). (Attachments: # 1 IFP Application)(Lundstrom, T)
May 6, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Correcting Plaintiff's Name on Docket, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 5/3/13: The Clerk of Court to correct the docket and update the Court's records to change Plaintiff's name from "Gary Dale Barger" to "Gary Francis Fisher". (Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fisher v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Francis Fisher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]