Brandstatt v. California Substance Abuse and Treatment Facility, et al.

Defendant: L. D. Zamora, C. Nyenke, Godwin Ugwueze, Tiggs-Brown, Anthony Enenmoh, State Prison Medical Staff and California Substance Abuse and Treatment Facility
Plaintiff: William Hubert Loyd Brandstatt
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00434
Filed: March 25, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Ralph R. Beistline
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to COMPLY signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 7/18/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
August 7, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 8 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 08/07/2013. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Application) (Flores, E)
August 12, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court DISMISSAL ORDER, signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 8/12/13: The Complaint is DISMISSED, without prejudice; Plaintiff has until September 13, 2013, within which to file his amended complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint - blank form)(Hellings, J)
October 9, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court DISMISSAL ORDER, signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 10/9/2013. CASE CLOSED.(Fahrney, E)
December 16, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Motion at Docket 26 , signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 12/16/2013. (Marrujo, C)
April 2, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/1/13. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Application)(Verduzco, M)
June 13, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Motion At Docket No. 6 , signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 6/13/2013. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the motion to proceed in forma pauperis at Docket No. 6 is STRICKEN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before July 19, 2013, Plaintiff must comply with the Order dated April 1, 2013, or this matter will be dismissed, without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. (Fahrney, E)
July 9, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Motion at Docket No. 8 , signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 7/9/13: The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to re-serve the Order entered at Docket No. 3 on Plaintiff together with this Order; Deadline for Plaintiff to comply with Court Order set for August 29, 2013. (Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brandstatt v. California Substance Abuse and Treatment Facility, et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. D. Zamora
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Nyenke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Godwin Ugwueze
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiggs-Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Enenmoh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Prison Medical Staff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Substance Abuse and Treatment Facility
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hubert Loyd Brandstatt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]