McClintic et al v. United States Postal Service et al

Defendant: United States Postal Service and Bertha Cervantes
Plaintiff: Joseph Robert McClintic and Marlene A Hubbell
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00439
Filed: March 23, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Appointing Guardian Ad Litem for Joseph McClintic re 3 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/22/2013. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Marlene A. Hubbell is appointed as guardian ad litem for plaintiff Joseph Robert McClintic in this action.(Martinez, A)
June 21, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Defendant United States' Unopposed 23 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/21/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
October 4, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 32 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/4/13. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 18, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 18, 2013. Scheduling Conference currently set for 1/8/2014 has been CONTINUED to 2/26/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. 41 MOTION to DISMISS currently set for 12/5/2013 has been CONTINUED to 2/6/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Munoz, I)
December 20, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Re Subject Matter Jurisdiction, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/19/2013. (Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing on or before 1/10/2014 why the two federal claims should not be dismissed and the refore why the entire FAC should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The hearing on the pending motion to dismiss, Doc. 41, currently set for 2/6/2014, is VACATED and all deadlines in connection with that motion are suspended pending the outcome of this Order to Show Cause.) (Gaumnitz, R)
January 7, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL'S MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record (Doc. 47 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/7/2014. (Arellano, S.)
January 14, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Decision and ORDER DISMISSING First Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter and Jurisdiction; and ORDER DENYING Without Prejudice as Moot 41 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/14/14. (Marrujo, C)
February 25, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to DISMISS, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/25/14. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McClintic et al v. United States Postal Service et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bertha Cervantes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Robert McClintic
Represented By: Bonnie J. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene A Hubbell
Represented By: Bonnie J. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]