Celedon v. Commisioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Maryann Celedon
Case Number: 1:2013cv00449
Filed: March 27, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING defendant's Motion to Stay the Proceedings, document 14 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/3/2013. (Rooney, M)
December 11, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for a continuance as outlined in this Order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 12/11/2013. (Rooney, M)
February 4, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING defendant an extension of time to 3/7/2014 in which to file opposition to plaintiff's opening brief. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 2/4/2014. (Rooney, M)
March 4, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 4/7/2014 for the filing of defendant's responsive brief. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 3/4/2014. (Rooney, M)
September 12, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 1 Social Security Appeal and Remanding Action for Further Administrative Proceedings, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 09/11/14. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
April 3, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 4 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/2/13. (Gonzalez, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Celedon v. Commisioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Matthew Weinberg, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryann Celedon
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.