Byron v. Superior Court of California

Respondent: Superior Court of California
Petitioner: Curt Allen Byron
Case Number: 1:2013cv00456
Filed: March 28, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Motion To Stay (Doc. 3 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/5/2014. (Fahrney, E)
October 31, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Declining to Issue Certificate of Appealability, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/30/14. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
April 3, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Petition should not be Dismissed for Petitioner's Failure to Exhaust State Remedies signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/2/2013. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byron v. Superior Court of California
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Superior Court of California
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Curt Allen Byron
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]