Kenya Darrick Caldwell v. City of Selma et al

Defendant: City of Selma, Thomas Whiteside and Steve Burgamy
Plaintiff: Kenya Darrick Caldwell
Case Number: 1:2013cv00465
Filed: March 28, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Stanley A Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2015 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendants' Request to Place Documents Under Seal, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/1/15. (Verduzco, M)
April 16, 2015 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 69 Motion for Summary Judgment and Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/15/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
November 22, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER and ORDER Regarding Police and Sheriff's Reports, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/22/2013. (Kusamura, W)
June 11, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulation for protective order and Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/11/2014. (Figueroa, O)
July 11, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON SECOND STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/11/2014. (Arellano, S.)
April 2, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDERED Clerk of Court to Issue Summons; ORDER DIRECTING US Marshal to serve a copy of the complaint, summons and this order upon the Defendant as directed by the Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 04/02/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 29, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 24 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/29/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
August 29, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Stipulation to Compel Plaintiff to Attend Independent Psychological Examination. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/29/2014. (Hernandez, M)
September 3, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AMENDING Order Granting Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment And Striking The Judgment (ECF Nos. 48 , 49 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/2/2014. Due to administrative error, the order granting partial summary judgment shall be amended as follows: The order is amended at 1:17 to read: Currently before the Court is Defendants motion for summary judgment filed July 25, 2014. The order is amended at 21:12 to read: Defendants partial motion for summary judgment is GRANTED.(Fahrney, E)
September 25, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/25/2014. (Timken, A)
December 2, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 58 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER and VACATING pending dates. The Motion to Withdraw as Attorney set for hearing on 12/10/2014 shall remain on calendar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/1/2014. (Hernandez, M)
December 10, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MILTON GREG MULLANAX' MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO ALLOW INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF re 55 , 58 , 61 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/10/2014. Attorney, Milton Greg Mullanax terminated. Filing Deadline: 1/13/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
January 27, 2015 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendant's request to file documents under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/27/2015. (Hernandez, M)
January 29, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Ever Jean Kelley to Submit Resume signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/28/2015. (Flores, E)
January 30, 2015 85 Opinion or Order of the Court INFORMATIONAL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/30/2015. (Flores, E)
February 18, 2015 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request for an Extension of Time and CONTINUING Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment to April 15, 2015 at 10:00 A.M. in Courtroom 9 86 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/18/15 : Five Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
February 24, 2015 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Basic Competency, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/24/15. Plaintiff shall file an opposition to the motion for summary judgment by April 1, 2015. (Marrujo, C)
March 5, 2015 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 90 Motion to Recuse Magistrate Judge signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/05/2015. (Flores, E)
March 26, 2015 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Clarifying Claims and Requiring Defendants to Respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/26/2015. (Hernandez, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenya Darrick Caldwell v. City of Selma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Selma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Whiteside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Burgamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenya Darrick Caldwell
Represented By: Milton Greg Mullanax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]