Rossman v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Debbie Jean Rossman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2013cv00467
Filed: March 29, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 22, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Briefing Schedule: Plaintiff's Openign Brief filed by 12/23/2013. Defendant opposition filed by 1/24/2014. Reply by plaintiff by 1/31/2014. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/22/2013. (Herman, H)
January 31, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to ExTend Briefing Schedule: Defendants' brief filed on January 30, 2014 (Doc. 19) is deemed timely filed. Plaintiff's reply, if any, wil be due 2/6/2014. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/31/2014. (Herman, H)
July 29, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming Agency's Denial of Benefits and Ordering Judgment for Commissioner, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/29/14. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
April 8, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees 5 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/8/13. (Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rossman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Jean Rossman
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Paul Sachelari, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.