Garcia v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Lena Garcia
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00477
Filed: April 2, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
 
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2013 3 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/5/2013. (Marrujo, C)
April 10, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING the complaint with leave to amend for failure to state facts sufficient to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within thirty days of service of this order curing the deficiences identified by the Court. Plaintiff shall also retain an attorney to represent her daughter. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/10/2013. (Rooney, M)
May 7, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint, document 5 . Plaintiff's first amended complaint is due by 6/10/2013, with NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS BEING GRANTED. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/7/2013. (Rooney, M)
July 2, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE for Failure to Comply With Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/29/13. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Garcia v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena Garcia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]