Dhaliwal et al v. Singh et al

Defendant: Chandi Brothers, LLC, KS Chandi & Sons, Inc., Nirmal Singh, Susana E. Chandi, Nachhattar S. Chandi and Valley Petroleum Inc.
Plaintiff: Jagjeevan K. Dhaliwal and Mohinder S. Gill
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00484
Filed: April 3, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2014 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING PLAINTIFFS' UNILATERAL PRETRIAL STATEMENT (DOC. 101) AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 21, 2014. RESPONSE DUE BY 3:00PM ON 8/22/2014. (Munoz, I)
September 4, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER notifying parties of requirements for Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/4/2014. (Hernandez, M)
September 5, 2014 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER imposing sanctions for plaintiff's failure to appear at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/4/2014. (Hernandez, M)
September 16, 2014 124 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Re Defendants' Motion To Expunge Lis Pendens (Doc. 103 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/16/2014. (Fahrney, E)
September 18, 2014 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER For Expungement Of Notice Of Pendency Of Action (Doc. 103 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/18/2014. (Fahrney, E)
September 18, 2014 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Defendants' Request For Attorney's Fees And Costs (Doc. 103 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/18/2014. The Court finds that $350.00 per hour is a reasonable rate but that 3.5 hours is a reasonable amount of time here. Counsel for Defendants is therefore awarded $1,225.00 in attorneys fees and costs associated with bringing the motion to expunge.(Fahrney, E)
September 30, 2014 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Motions in Limine (Docs. 121 , 122 , 123 ), (Jury Trial 10/15/2014), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/29/2014. (Fahrney, E)
June 12, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER On Defendant's F.R.Civ.P.12 Motion To Dismiss And To Strike (Doc. 6 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/11/2013. (Fahrney, E)
August 16, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Defendants' F.R.Civ.P. 12 Motions 16 , 18 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/16/13: Chandi & Sons and Chandi Brothers shall file and serve an answer to the FAC, no later than September 4, 2013. (Hellings, J)
September 30, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Award Attorney Fees 26 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/27/13. (Verduzco, M)
January 6, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER On 43 Request to Continue Hearing on Summary Adjudication signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/6/2014. (Hearing on 41 Motion For Summary Judgment set 2/4/2014 is VACATED, Responses due by 2/17/2014, Replies due by 2/24/2014, Court will rule on motion without a hearing unless otherwise ordered, Show Cause Response due by 1/10/2014.) (Gaumnitz, R)
January 21, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Striking Defendants' 45 Reply Brief and ORDER Denying Defendants' 39 Motion to File an Counterclaim, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/21/2014. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 1. Defendants' reply brief is STRICKEN due to its untimeliness; and 2. Defendants' motion to amend the answer to file counterclaims is DENIED. Motion Hearing set 1/22/2014 is VACATED.)(Gaumnitz, R)
March 5, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication 41 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/5/14. (Verduzco, M)
June 30, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 67 Defendants' Motion to Strike. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/28/2014. (Timken, A)
June 30, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR EXCLUSIONARY SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO RULE 37 60 ; ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENT INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND PROVIDE DOCUMENTS BY JULY 15, 2014. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/28/2014. (Timken, A)
July 7, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Re Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. 54 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/7/2014. (Gaumnitz, R)
July 11, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL 63 and 65 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/11/2014. (Timken, A)
July 29, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failing to appear at Settlement Conference. Order to Show Hearing set for 9/3/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/28/2014. (Hernandez, M)
July 31, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why sanctions should not be imposed for failing to appear at the Settlement Conference. The Court set a hearing for 9/3/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/31/2014. (Hernandez, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dhaliwal et al v. Singh et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandi Brothers, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KS Chandi & Sons, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nirmal Singh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susana E. Chandi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nachhattar S. Chandi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Petroleum Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jagjeevan K. Dhaliwal
Represented By: Lee H Durst
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohinder S. Gill
Represented By: Lee H Durst
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]