Gorski v. Department of Justice Bureau of Criminal Identification and Information

Defendant: Department of Justice Bureau of Criminal Identification and Information
Plaintiff: Robert Carl Gorski
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00489
Filed: April 4, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE for Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief may be Granted, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/3/2013. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
November 19, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 13 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/19/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
June 25, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Motion # 7 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/25/2013. (Fahrney, E)
September 16, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Complaint and Granting Plaintiff Leave to File an Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/15/13. 30-Day Deadline. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint Form)(Verduzco, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gorski v. Department of Justice Bureau of Criminal Identification and Information
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice Bureau of Criminal Identification and Information
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Carl Gorski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]