Hawkins v. Medtronic, Inc. et al

Defendant: Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA Inc and Medtronic, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gary Hawkins
Case Number: 1:2013cv00499
Filed: April 3, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/16/2013 vacating hearing date and taking matter under submission re 11 Motion to Dismiss. (Lundstrom, T)
September 12, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to CONTINUE the Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 9/24/2013, is CONTINUED to 11/12/2013, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/12/2013. (Timken, A)
November 1, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to CONTINUE Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 11/12/2013, is CONTINUED to 12/12/2013, at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/1/2013. (Timken, A)
January 29, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/29/2014. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The scheduling conference set for February 4, 2014, is CONTINUED to May 1, 2014, at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto.); and 2. The parties joint scheduling report shall be filed on or before April 24, 2014.) (Gaumnitz, R)
January 30, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING defendants' Motion to Dismiss, document 11 , with leave to amend. Amended complaint due within thirty days from the date of service of this order. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/30/2014. (Rooney, M)
February 27, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court Order extending time to file amended complaint, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/27/2014. ( Amended Complaint due by 4/3/2014) (Figueroa, O)
February 28, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/27/2014. Plaintiff shall file his First Amended Complaint on or before March 31, 2014. (Timken, A)
April 22, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to CONTINUE Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 5/1/2014, is CONTINUED to 8/7/2014, at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall file their joint scheduling report by no later than 7/31/2014. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/22/2014. (Timken, A)
May 27, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING Hearing Date and Taking Matter Under Submission, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/27/2014. (The hearing date of June 2, 2014 is hereby VACATED and the parties shall not appear at that time. The Court will take motion to dismiss 49 and motion to strike 50 under submission and thereafter issue its decision.) (Gaumnitz, R)
November 20, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendants' 50 Motion to Strike and Granting in Part and Denying in Part 49 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/20/2014. (Gaumnitz, R)
December 3, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to CONTINUE Defendants Medtronic, Inc. and Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc's last day to file answer to Plaintiff's first amended complaint. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading on or before December 30, 2014. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/2/2014. (Timken, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Medtronic, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA Inc
Represented By: Michael K Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc.
Represented By: Michael K Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Hawkins
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]