Hernandez et al v. Kern County Medical Center et al

Defendant: Delano Regional Medical Center, County of Kern, Kern County Medical Center, Lawrence S. Garcia, Eric P. Hoffman and United States of America
Plaintiff: Jasmin Delila Hernandez and Nohemi Gallegos
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00500
Filed: April 4, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER re Stipulation for Continuance of Joint Scheduling Conference 11 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/26/2013. Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 9/12/2013 at 09:00 AM at the United States Courthouse, 510 19th Street (JLT), Bakersfield, before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
March 13, 2014 28 Featured Case STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING OF UNITED STATES' MOTION TO DISMISS; AND ORDER TO DENY CONTINUANCE OF HEARING signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on March 13, 2014. Motion Hearing currently set for 3/20/2014 is VACATED. (Munoz, I)
March 19, 2014 29 Featured Case ORDER On Motion To Dismiss (Doc. 25 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/18/2014. REMANDING CASE to Superior Court of California, County of Kern. Copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED.(Fahrney, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hernandez et al v. Kern County Medical Center et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delano Regional Medical Center
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Kern
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern County Medical Center
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence S. Garcia
Represented By: Alyson A. Berg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric P. Hoffman
Represented By: John Anthony Jurich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Alyson A. Berg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmin Delila Hernandez
Represented By: Mauro Fiore, NCAED
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nohemi Gallegos
Represented By: Mauro Fiore, NCAED
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]