Ballweber-Smith v. Crossmark Inc.

Defendant: Crossmark Inc.
Plaintiff: Jacqulyn Ballweber-Smith
Case Number: 1:2013cv00501
Filed: April 4, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Stanley A Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court Order GRANTING SECOND 10 Stipulation to Extend Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/4/2014. (The dispositive motion filing deadline is continued from April 4, 2014 to April 25, 2014.)(Gaumnitz, R)
April 25, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring parties to file dispositional documents. All pending matters and dates are vacated. The parties shall file dispositional documents on or before 6/9/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/25/2014. (Hernandez, M)
May 20, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/20/2014 on joint stipulation of dismissal of entire action with prejudice. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
February 18, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court Order GRANTING 8 stipulation to extend dispositive motion filing deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/18/2014. Dispositive Motions filed by 4/4/2014. (Figueroa, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ballweber-Smith v. Crossmark Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crossmark Inc.
Represented By: Lara Cardin de Leon
Represented By: Rafael G. Nendel-Flores
Represented By: Kelley Alisa Bolar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqulyn Ballweber-Smith
Represented By: Barry E Weber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]