Alcocer v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Maria Isabel Alcocer
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2013cv00514
Filed: April 9, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time: Plaintiff has until 10/25/2013 to file Plaintiff's confidential settlement letter; and all other deadlines shall be extended accordingly. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/30/2013. (Herman, H)
October 24, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/24/2013. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
April 16, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. 4 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/15/2013. (Fahrney, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alcocer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Isabel Alcocer
Represented By: Brian C. Shapiro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Matthew Weinberg, GOVT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]