Browning Contractors, Inc. v. United States of America, Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service

Plaintiff: Browning Contractors, Inc.
Defendant: United States of America, Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00518
Filed: April 10, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2014 13 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER Modifying Case Schedule: Non-Expert Discovery by 3/21/2014. Expert Discovery by 3/21/2014. Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 3/21/2014. Dispositive Motions filed by 4/18/2014. Dispositive Motion Hearing by 5/19/2014. Pretrial Conference and Jury Trial dates remain as set in Aug. 15, 2013 Scheduling Order (Doc. 11). signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/13/2014. (Herman, H)
February 18, 2014 16 Featured Case ORDER AFTER SETTLEMENT DIRECTING the parties to file the appropriate dismissal documents by 3/7/2014. All pending deadlines and hearing are VACATED. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/14/2014. (Rooney, M)
May 6, 2014 19 Featured Case ORDER for DISMISSAL Following Settlement, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/6/14: This case is DISMISSED in total and with prejudice. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Browning Contractors, Inc. v. United States of America, Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Browning Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: David John Weiland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]