Williams v. Bigot et al

Defendant: Daniel Wagoner and Marissa Bigot
Plaintiff: Michael B. Williams
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00556
Filed: April 18, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Michael J. Seng
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Reconsideration Of Magistrate's Screening Order (ECF No. 10 ), Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty Days, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/19/2013. (Fahrney, E)
October 1, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Obey a Court Order and Failure to Prosecute 16 THIRTY (30) DAY DEADLINE, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/30/13. (Hellings, J)
November 4, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER (1) DISCHARGING 20 Order to Show Cause, (2) DENYING Without Prejudice Appointment of Counsel, and (3) DISMISSING 22 First Amended Complaint WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/1/2013. Amended Complaint Due in Thirty Days. (Attachments: # 1 1983 Amended Complaint Form) (Marrujo, C)
November 22, 2013 25 Featured Case VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of ACTION, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/21/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
April 19, 2013 3 Featured Case ORDER to Submit a Non-Prisoner Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis OR Pay the $350.00 Filing Fee Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/19/2013. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Application)(Marrujo, C)
May 3, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER Granting 4 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/3/13. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Motion) (Gonzalez, R)
May 14, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Appointment Of Counsel (ECF No. 1 ), Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/13/2013. First Amended Complaint due by 6/17/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint Form, # 2 Complaint filed April 18, 2013)(Fahrney, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Williams v. Bigot et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Wagoner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marissa Bigot
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael B. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]