Cranford v. Perryman et al

Defendant: Stefeni Vally, Senait Endile and Samantha Perryman
Plaintiff: Archie Cranford
Case Number: 1:2013cv00581
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/27/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
December 2, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 12 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/27/2013. (Jessen, A)
April 29, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SUBMIT a Non-Prisoner Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or PAY the $350.00 Filing Fee within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/29/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Non-Prisoner IFP Application)(Sant Agata, S)
June 7, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 6 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/6/2013. (Jessen, A)
July 2, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND (ECF No. 1 ), Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty (30) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/1/2013. Amended Complaint due by 8/5/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint filed April 22, 2013, # 2 Amended Complaint Form)(Fahrney, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cranford v. Perryman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefeni Vally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senait Endile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archie Cranford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.