Lang v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Stephanie Lynn Lang
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00590
Filed: April 23, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
 
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 26, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER extend briefing schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/26/2013. (Hernandez, M)
April 8, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Social Security Appeal and Remanding for Further Development of the Record, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/08/14. CASE CLOSED.(Gonzalez, R)
May 8, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 4 Motion to Proceed IFP ; ORDER DIRECTING to Issue a Summons and DIRECTING to serve a copy of the complaint, summons and this order upon the Defendant as directed by the Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 05/07/2013. (Attachments: # 1 USM INSTRUCTIONS) (Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lang v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Timothy Bolin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Lynn Lang
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]