Esparza v. Mims

Defendant: Margaret Mims
Plaintiff: Ruben S. Esparza
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00593
Filed: April 24, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Payment Of Inmate Filing Fee (Doc. 2 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/2/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's IFP Application) (Fahrney, E)
September 16, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Complaint and Granting Plaintiff Leave to File an Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/15/13. Amended Complaint Due in Thirty Days. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint Form)(Gonzalez, R)
May 8, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE (Strike), with Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief may be Granted Under Section 1983; ORDER THAT THIS DISMISSAL IS SUBJECT TO THE "THREE STRIKES" PROVISION SET FORTH IN 28 U.S.C. 1915(g); ORDER for Clerk to CLOSE this CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/8/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Esparza v. Mims
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Mims
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben S. Esparza
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]