Kamalu v. Walmart Stores, Inc.

Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stella Kamalu
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00627
Filed: April 29, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Referring Judge: Stanley A Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoena for Mobile Phone Records (Docs. 17 , [18), Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/15/2013. (Arellano, S.)
February 20, 2014 24 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/20/2014. (Hernandez, M)
March 25, 2014 29 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/24/2014, re: Amended Stip[ulation to Continue Scheduled dates: Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off 9/10/2014, Expert Disclosure ddl 10/4/2014, Supplemental Expert Disclosure ddl: 11/1/2014, Expert Disc overy Cut-Off: 12/6/2014, Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 9/10/2014, Dispositive Motions filed by 10/16/2014, Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9, Jury Trial set for 3/10/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Kusamura, W)
April 17, 2014 32 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request to have this matter referred to the Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program. The parties are DIRECTED to complete the mediation on or before 7/25/2014. The Court further sets a Settlement Confer ence for 5/22/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto with confidential settlement conference statements due one week prior the conference. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/17/2014. (Rooney, M)
April 21, 2014 33 Featured Case ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/21/2014. (Timken, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kamalu v. Walmart Stores, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin D. Whittaker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stella Kamalu
Represented By: Chijioke Ikonte
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]