United States v. Approximately $28,120.00 in U.S. Currency

Claimant: Jean Carlo Labanda, James Bryan Wolfe, Timothy Wayne Wolfe, Marquis Sutton and Marina Vorontsova
Defendant: Approximately $28,120.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00640
Filed: May 2, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
 
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to Vacate Status Conference and Set Scheduling Conference: Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 8/20/2013 to Monday, October 7, 2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. NOTE: parties did request and cleared the date of 9/30/2013 for the continuance, but now that date is NOT available. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/13/2013. (Herman, H)
September 26, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Continue Scheduling Conference: (re 15 Stipulation) - Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 10/7/2013 to November 21, 2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/25/2013. (Herman, H)
April 2, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Extending Claimant's Time to File Summary Judgment Motion: (parties Stipulation [Doc. 27]) - deadline for Claimant Jean Carlo Labanda to file a summary judgment motion is extended to 4/15/2014. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/1/2014. (Herman, H)
May 6, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the 29 MOTION to DISMISS Hearing from 5/27/2014 to 7/28/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/6/2014. (Kusamura, W)
May 14, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION to (1) Stay Discovery for 120 days; (2) Withdraw Claimant's Motion to Stay Discovery; and (3) Continue Scheduling Conference Order Dates; ORDER. (1) Discovery is STAYED for 120 days from the date of this order; (2) Claimant's Motion to stay discovery (Doc. 30) is withdrawn and the hearing set for 5/27/2014 at 11:00 am is VACATED; (3) All dates currently set forth in Court's Schedule Order (Doc. 26) shall be rescheduled to the follo wing dates: 1. Non-Expert Discovery by 1/10/2015. 2. Expert Disclosures by 1/10/2015. 3. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures by 2/5/2015. 4. Expert Discovery by 3/11/2015. 5. Non-Dispositive Motion filing by 5/8/2015. 6. Dispositive Motion filing b y 6/10/2015. 7. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 9/16/2015 (was 6/10/2015) at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. 8. JURY TRIAL set for 11/17/2015 (was 8/11/2015) at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/14/2014. (Herman, H)
July 25, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating hearing date of July 28, 2014 and taking matter under submission signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/25/14. (Nazaroff, H)
October 2, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference Order Dates; ORDER - Non-Expert continued from 1/10/2015 to April 10, 2015; Expert Discovery by continued from 3/11/2015 to April 10, 2015. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/2/2014. (Herman, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States v. Approximately $28,120.00 in U.S. Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jean Carlo Labanda
Represented By: Jackie-Lynn Adams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James Bryan Wolfe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Timothy Wayne Wolfe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Marquis Sutton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Marina Vorontsova
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $28,120.00 in U.S. Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Heather Mardel Jones
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Spivak, GOVT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]