Morales v. Northern Village Associates, LP et al

Defendant: Briad Restaurant Group, LLC and Northern Village Associates, LP
Plaintiff: John Morales
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00643
Filed: May 2, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Stanley A Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2013 14 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER (Fed.R.Civ.P 16), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/8/2013. (Initial Disclosures: 9/6/2013, Non-Expert Discovery: 4/9/2014, Expert Disclosure: 3/12/2014, Supplemental Expert Disclosure: 4/9/2014, Expert Discovery: 4/23/2014, Non-Dispositive Motion Filing ddl: 4/9/2014, Dispositive Motion Filing ddl: 6/6/2014, Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2014, at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill., and Jury Trial (5 Days) set for 10/21/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill.) (Gaumnitz, R)
October 31, 2013 17 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/30/13. (Verduzco, M)
January 21, 2014 22 Featured Case STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION with prejudice;ORDER, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/21/2014. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Morales v. Northern Village Associates, LP et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briad Restaurant Group, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen M. Hartman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Village Associates, LP
Represented By: Steven Ralph Stoker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Morales
Represented By: Tanya E. Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]