Morales v. Constance et al

Defendant: Safi Saleh Alamri and Marilyn J. Constance
Plaintiff: John Morales
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00651
Filed: May 3, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Michael J. Seng
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2013 20 Featured Case STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MANDATORY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE and ORDER. The Initial Scheduling Conference set for October 25, 2013 is CONTINUED to November 8, 2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/18/2013. (Yu, L)
January 16, 2014 25 Featured Case ORDER AFTER SETTLEMENT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/16/2014. (Dismissal Deadline set for 2/21/2014).(Lundstrom, T)
January 22, 2014 27 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/21/2014. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Morales v. Constance et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safi Saleh Alamri
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn J. Constance
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Morales
Represented By: Tanya E. Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]