Mann et al v. Delaware North Companies Incorporated et al

Defendant: DNC Parks and Resorts, Inc., Delaware North Companies Travel Hospitality Services, Inc., Delaware North Companies Parks & Resorts, Inc., Delaware North Companies Incorporated, DNC Parks and Resorts at Yosemite, Inc., Curry Village and Camp Curry
Plaintiff: Sherrie Mann and Roger Mann
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00666
Filed: May 7, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER for Dismissal Without Prejudice, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/16/2013. Plaintiffs' Complaint ONLY as against Defendants DELAWARE NORTH COMPANIES, INC., DELAWARE NORTH COMPANIES PARKS & RESORTS, INC., DELAWARE NORTH COMPANIES TRAVEL HOSPITALITY SERVICES, INC., DNC PARKS & RESORTS, INC., CURRY VILLAGE, AND CAMP CURRY, is hereby dismissed without prejudice. (Marrujo, C)
October 25, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER vacating hearing of October 28, 2013 and taking matter under submission signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/25/13. (Nazaroff, H)
March 18, 2014 46 Featured Case ORDER on STIPULATION to CONTINUE Scheduling Conference. The scheduling conference currently set for 3/27/2014, in Mann v. USA, No. 1:13-cv-01827-AWI-SKO, and related case Mann v. DNC Parks & Resorts at Yosemite, Inc., et al., No. 1:13- cv-00666-AWI-SKO is CONTINUED to Thursday, 6/26/2014, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. In both Mann v. USA, No. 1:13-cv-01827-AWI-SKO, and related case Mann v. D NC Parks & Resorts at Yosemite, Inc., et al., 1:13-cv-00666-AWI-SKO, the parties shall file a joint scheduling report on or before 6/19/2014. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/18/2014. (Timken, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mann et al v. Delaware North Companies Incorporated et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DNC Parks and Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph E. Addiego, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware North Companies Travel Hospitality Services, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph E. Addiego, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware North Companies Parks & Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph E. Addiego, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware North Companies Incorporated
Represented By: Joseph E. Addiego, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DNC Parks and Resorts at Yosemite, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph E. Addiego, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curry Village
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camp Curry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrie Mann
Represented By: Robert Walter Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Mann
Represented By: Robert Walter Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]