Barapind v Government of the Republic of India, et al

Defendant: Ananya Gautam, Lok Nath Angra, Sumedh Singh Saini, Sukhbir Singh Badal, Parkash Singh Badal, Shivraj Patil, Ashwani Kumar, S.C. Sinha, Shivshankar Menon, Shushilkumar Shinde, Salman Khurshid, Somanahalli Mallaiah Krishna, Manmohan Singh, Pranab Mukherjee, The Punjab Police, The State Government of Pubjab, Government of the Republic of India, Dhanpreet Kaur, Rajinder Singh, Angrej Singh, Jaswinder Singh, Shiv Kumar, Dharam Singh Uppal, Rakesh Kumar and Sarabjit Singh
Plaintiff: Kulvir Singh Barapind
Case Number: 1:2013cv00667
Filed: May 7, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 22, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice of Filing Voluntary Dismissal and ORDER against the following Defendants: Sukhbir Singh Badal (Deputy Chief Minister fo the State of Punjab), Ananya Gautam (Director Inspector General of Punjab Police), Dhanpreet Kaur (Senior Superintend ent of the Punjab Police), Salman Khurshid (Minister of External Affairs for the Government of India), Somanahalli Mallaiah Krishna (Former Minister of External Affairs for the Government of India), Ashwani Kumar (Minister of Law and Justice for t he Government of India), Rakesh Kumar, Shiv Kumar, Shivshankar Menon (National Security Advisor for the Government of India), Pranab Mukherjee (President of the Government of India), Shivraj Patil (Governor of the State of Pubjab), Sumedh Singh Sa ini (Director General of the Punjab Police), Shushilkumar Shinde (Minister of Home Affairs for the Government of India), Angrej Singh, Jaswinder Singh, Manmohan Singh (Prime Minister of the Government of India), Rajinder Singh (Superintendent of Police of the Punjab Police ), Sarabjit Singh, S.C. Sinha (Director of National Investigation Agency for the Government of India), Dharam Singh Uppal, Lok Nath Angra (Director Inspector General of the Punjab Police in Jalandhar) and Parkash Singh Badal (Chief Minister of the State of Punjab), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/21/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 2, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Scheduling Conference, Joint Scheduling Conference Statement and Rule 26(f) Requirements signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/2/2014. Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 4/9/2014 is CONTINUED to 6/4/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. (Martinez, A)
April 3, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating hearing date of April 7, 2014 and taking matter under submission signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/2/14. (Nazaroff, H)
May 20, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting leave to file supplemental responses, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 05/19/2014. (Supplemental Response filed by 6/12/2014) (Figueroa, O)
May 21, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING the hearing on the Motion to Amend, document 51 , currently scheduled for hearing on 5/27/2014 before Judge Ishii. The Court further orders defendants' request for consolidation of oral argument for that motion with plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the complaint, DENIED. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/20/2014. (Rooney, M)
May 29, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Scheduling Conference, Joint Scheduling Conference Statement, and Rule 26(a) and (f) Requirements signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/29/2014. Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 6/4/2014 is CONTINUED to 8/11/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. (Martinez, A)
September 26, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 40 , 48 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/26/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barapind v Government of the Republic of India, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ananya Gautam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lok Nath Angra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumedh Singh Saini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sukhbir Singh Badal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkash Singh Badal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shivraj Patil
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashwani Kumar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.C. Sinha
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shivshankar Menon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shushilkumar Shinde
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salman Khurshid
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Somanahalli Mallaiah Krishna
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manmohan Singh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pranab Mukherjee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Punjab Police
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State Government of Pubjab
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government of the Republic of India
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dhanpreet Kaur
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajinder Singh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angrej Singh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaswinder Singh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiv Kumar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dharam Singh Uppal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rakesh Kumar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarabjit Singh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kulvir Singh Barapind
Represented By: Kamardeep Singh Athwal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]