Broadway v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Deon D Broadway
Case Number: 1:2013cv00793
Filed: May 24, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 23, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER re Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's opening brief shall be filed no later than February 3, 2014; Defendant's responsive brief shall be filed no later than March 10, 2014; and Plaintiff may file an optional reply brief no later than March 28, 2014. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/23/2013. (Timken, A)
August 27, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Plaintiff's Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/26/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
November 20, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER for Attorneys Fees and Expenses. Plaintiff is awarded attorney's fees in the amount of $4,900.00, and expenses in the amount of $68.31, for a total sum of $4,968.31. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/20/2014. (Timken, A)
May 29, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/28/2013. (Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadway v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Annabelle J. Yang, GOVT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deon D Broadway
Represented By: Kelsey Mackenzie Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]