Castaneda v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michelle E Castaneda
Case Number: 1:2013cv00974
Filed: June 26, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION for Extension; ORDER Thereon - the time for Defendant to file an answered is extended to 4/30/2014. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/13/2014. (Herman, H)
May 15, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING Briefing Schedule (re 18 Stipulation): Plaintiff has until 5/27/2014 to file a reply brief. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/15/2014. (Herman, H)
October 1, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Reversing Agency's Denial Of Benefits And Ordering Remand, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/1/2014. CASE CLOSED.(Fahrney, E)
June 26, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/26/2013. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castaneda v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Theophous H. Reagans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle E Castaneda
Represented By: Kelsey Mackenzie Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]