Moore v. Torigian et al

Defendant: Takoohi Torigian and Andre Torigian
Plaintiff: Ronald Moore
Case Number: 1:2013cv01063
Filed: July 11, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Mandatory Scheduling Conference: Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 10/31/2013 to November 18, 2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/25/2013. (Herman, H)
November 12, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFTER SETTLEMENT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/12/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
December 2, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION For Dismissal Of Action; ORDER, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/27/2013. CASE CLOSED.(Fahrney, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Torigian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takoohi Torigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Torigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Moore
Represented By: Tanya E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.