Richard Maquinales v. Ogbuehi et al

Defendant: K Malloy, Yeadon, I Ornelas, Luong Nguyen and Ogbuehi
Plaintiff: Richard Maquinales
Case Number: 1:2013cv01093
Filed: July 17, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, Thirty-Day Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/3/2014. (First Amended Complaint due by 3/10/2014) (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint Form)(Fahrney, E)
July 10, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Complaint without Leave to Amend for Failure to State a Claim for Which Relief May be Granted, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 07/09/14. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
July 19, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to File In Forma Pauperis Application on Form Provided With Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/19/2013. (Motion for IFP Due Within Forty-Five Days.) (Attachments: # 1 IFP Application)(Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Maquinales v. Ogbuehi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yeadon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I Ornelas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luong Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ogbuehi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Maquinales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.