St. Clair v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al

Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A., As Trustee For Washington Mutual Mortgage Pass-through Certificates, WMalt Series 2007-OA3, Mortgage Electronic Systems, Inc. and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Richard St. Clair
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01317
Filed: August 19, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
 
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2013 17 Featured Case STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings; ORDER - defendant JP Morgan Chase bank, N.A. response to Plaintiff's complaint must be filed by 11/4/2013. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/7/2013. (Herman, H)
November 25, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER on Stipulation and Resetting Matter to January 24, 2014, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/25/13. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Verduzco, M)
January 23, 2014 34 Featured Case ORDER VACATING January 27, 2014 Hearing Date and Taking Matter Under Submission, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 01/23/2014. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 2, 2014 37 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference: Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 4/21/2014 to June 2, 2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The joint scheduling conference report shall be due one week in advance, on or before May 26, 2014. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/1/2014. (Herman, H)
May 23, 2014 40 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference: Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 6/2/2014 to July 29, 2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/23/2014. (Herman, H)
August 18, 2014 48 Featured Case ORDER assigning case to Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe for all further proceedings signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/18/2014. New Case Number is 1:13-cv-01317-BAM.(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: St. Clair v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A., As Trustee For Washington Mutual Mortgage Pass-through Certificates, WMalt Series 2007-OA3
Represented By: Regina J. McClendon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Regina J. McClendon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Regina J. McClendon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard St. Clair
Represented By: Charles T. Marshall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]