Curry v. Heid, et al.

Defendant: Richard Mehaffey, United States and Tom Heid
Plaintiff: Clifford E. Curry, Sr.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01382
Filed: August 29, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Refer Motion to Magistrate Judge and to Vacate Hearing, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/9/2013. ( 9 MOTION to DISMISS filed by United States referred to Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe to issue findings and recomme ndations or orders deemed appropriate. This Court VACATES the November 14, 2013 hearing on the motion to dismiss set before U.S. District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and ORDERS the parties not to appear in Court at the time set for the hearing.) (Gaumnitz, R)
October 10, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court Informational ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/9/2013. (Herman, H)
November 8, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/8/2013 vacating hearing date and taking matter under submission re 9 , 12 Motion to Dismiss. (Lundstrom, T)
November 27, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint 1 and Defendant Mehaffey re 9 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/27/13. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Fifteen Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
September 6, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court Ex Parte Request to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint [Doc. 7]; ORDER - Defendant's responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint is extended from 9/5/2013 to 10/3/2013. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/6/2013. (Herman, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Curry v. Heid, et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Mehaffey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Alyson A. Berg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Heid
Represented By: Alyson A. Berg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford E. Curry, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]