Carrasco v. C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.

Defendant: C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc., Cheyenne Barcelona and Sean Nelsen
Plaintiff: Desire Soares Carrasco
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01438
Filed: September 9, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
 
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 17 Plaintiff's MOTION to REMAND be denied and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss be partially granted and partially denied. Matter referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/27/2013. (Hernandez, M)
December 19, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 27 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/19/2013. (Granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss ; Denying 17 Motion to Remand, Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint shall be filed not later than 1/10/2014.) (Gaumnitz, R)
March 11, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/11/2014. (Hernandez, M)
April 16, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER partially approving the parties' stipulations, documents 37 and 38 , as follows. A settlement conference is set for 6/4/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. The parties' request to stay this action until completion of the settlement conference is DENIED. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/16/2014. (Rooney, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Carrasco v. C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Joshua Salinas
Represented By: Robert Brian Milligan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheyenne Barcelona
Represented By: Robert Brian Milligan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Nelsen
Represented By: Robert Brian Milligan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desire Soares Carrasco
Represented By: Jay A Christofferson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]