Curtis v. Coca-Cola Enterprises Bottling Companies

Plaintiff: Maurice J. Curtis
Defendant: Coca-Cola Enterprises Bottling Companies
Case Number: 1:2013cv01939
Filed: November 27, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing Settlement Conference from 8/4/2014 to 8/19/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Confidential settlement conference statements shall be submitted no later than one week prior to the continued conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/6/2014. (Hernandez, M)
July 23, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Stipulation for Leave to Permit Plaintiff to File a Second Amended Complaint, to Dismiss Valerie Bustamante as a Defendant and to Dismiss Certain Time-Barred Claims, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/22/2014. (Marrujo, C)
July 24, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating hearing date of August 4, 2014 signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/24/14. (Nazaroff, H)
August 6, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to continue Settlement Conference from 8/19/2014 to 9/30/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Confidential settlement statements are due directly to chambers one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/6/2014. (Hernandez, M)
September 5, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Pro Hac Vice Application (Doc. 29). The pro hac vice status of Attorney Amy Rossitto is REVOKED with prejudice. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/5/2014. (Herman, H)
September 18, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion to Strike Jury Demand 13 . The Court hereby GRANTS Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's demand for a jury trial (Doc. 13). Plaintiff's jury demand filed on February 12, 2014 is HEREBY STRICKEN. (Doc. 4). signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/17/2014. (Herman, H)
September 18, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/18/2014. (Herman, H)
September 25, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to continue Settlement Conference from 9/30/2014 to 1/20/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Confidential settlement statements are due directly to chambers one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/24/2014. (Hernandez, M)
October 27, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Stipulation to Withdraw Motion to Compel Second Session of Deposition of Plaintiff and for Sanctions. (1) Defendant's Motion to Compel shall be deemed withdrawn without prejudice; (2) The October 31, 2014 hearing dates on the Mot ion to Compel is VACATED; and (3) By virtue of entering into this Stipulation, the Parties do not waive and expressly reserve all claims, rights and defenses in this action including, but not limited to, with respect to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaiant and questions not answered by Plaintiff during the second session of his deposition on October 21, 2014. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/27/2014. (Herman, H)
November 13, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 38 Motion to Reconsider, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/12/2014. (Gaumnitz, R)
November 25, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why a Contempt Citation Should Not Issue Against Mario Valdez: SHOW CAUSE HEARING for Mario Valdez is set for December 19, 2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. MARIIO VALDEZ - Y OU ARE HEREBY ORDERED TO APPEAR on December 19, 2014 at 9:00 AM at the U.S. Courthouse, 2500 Tulare Street, Fresno, CA. Defendant shall personally served Mr. Valdez with a copy of this order and with a copy of Defendant's applicat ion papers for an order to show cause. No later than December 12, 2014, Mr. Valdez may file and serve papers to address his failure to appear and to show cause why he should not be held in civil contempt for failure to appear at his deposition. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/25/2014. (Herman, H)
December 22, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Denying Defendant's Motion for Contempt and for Sanctions Against Non Party Mario Valdez. Referred to Judge Ishii; within 15 days of service of this recommendation, any party may file written objections to these findings and recommendations with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/22/2014. (Herman, H)
January 12, 2015 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 64 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Denying 47 Motion for Sanctions, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/12/2015. (Gaumnitz, R)
January 13, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court Order VACATING settlement conference on January 20, 2015, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/13/2015. (Figueroa, O)
January 20, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc. 56): the Court RECOMMENDS that the motion to remand be DENIED. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due within fifteen (15) days of service of this recommendation, any party may file written objections to these findings and recommendations with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/20/2015. (Herman, H)
February 11, 2015 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 65 Motion For Jury Trial and Order Declining to Impose Sanctions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1927, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/10/2015. (Gaumnitz, R)
February 18, 2015 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 71 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/18/2015. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The Findings and Recommendations, issued January 20, 2015, are adopted in full; 2. Plaintiffs 56 Motion to Remand, filed on December 4, 2014, is DENIED.)(Gaumnitz, R)
March 18, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION of DISMISSAL of Action with Prejudice,signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 03/17/2015. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis v. Coca-Cola Enterprises Bottling Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice J. Curtis
Represented By: Jennifer R. Snyder, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca-Cola Enterprises Bottling Companies
Represented By: Sabrina Alexis Beldner
Represented By: Truc T. Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.