Natl Assn of Optomet, et al v. Lockyer, et al

 
Case Number: 2:2002cv01464
Filed: July 5, 2002
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2006 389 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/17/06 ORDERING that the previously-ordered stay 377 is hereby LIFTED. Within 30 days of this order, both parties shall submit to the court a brief which outlines the status of the case. Specifically, the parties should address the following: which motions remain to be adjudicated; which portions of the previously filed record are necessary to the resolution of each of the motions; and what effect, if any, the Cole decision has on the pending motions. The pending motions are SET for oral argument on 9/25/2006 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Duong, D)
July 13, 2009 469 Featured Case **VACATED PER 470 ORDER** ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/13/09 ORDERING pltfs shall file and serve not later than 45 days from the date of this order a motion for summary judgment on the issue remanded by the Ninth Circuit; d fts shall file cross-motion and opposition not later than 20 days thereafter; plfs shall file an opposition and reply not later than 10 days thereafter; dfts may file a reply not later than 10 days thereafter; a hearing on the motion is SET for 11/9/09 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom Four. (Carlos, K) Modified on 7/13/2009 (Matson, R).
July 13, 2009 470 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 7/13/2009 ORDERING 469 Order is hereby VACATED. (Matson, R)
October 2, 2009 472 Featured Case ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/01/09. Plaintiff is to file a notice of whether it wishes to continue litigation not later than twenty (20) days from the date of this order.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 16, 2009 475 Featured Case ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/15/2009; pltfs motion for summary judgment due by 1/20/2010; dfts shall file cross-motion and opposition no later than 2/17/2010; pltfs shall file opposition and reply no later than 3/10/2010; In Court Hearing set for 4/19/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Suttles, J)
January 22, 2010 494 Featured Case ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/22/10, ORDERING that the court tentatively GRANTS pltfs' motion 477 . Pltfs may file under SEAL pltfs' memo of points and authorities in support of the motion for summary judgment on P ike, the declaration of Roger G. Noll, exhibits attached thereto, and pltfs' separate statement of undisputed facts. The court will REVISIT whether these documents should be permanently sealed at a later time, when it is possible to perform the fact specific analysis required by Foltz.(Kastilahn, A)
February 25, 2010 519 Featured Case ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/25/2010, ORDERING that no later than 2/19/2010, dfts shall file their opposition to pltfs' Motion for Summary Judgment on Pike and Motion for Summary Judgment on Pike. No later than 3/15/201 0, pltfs shall file their opposition to dfts' motion and their reply brief. No later than 4/5/2010, dfts shall file their reply. The hearing on the parties' motions for summary judgment shall remain on calendar on April 19, 2010, at 9:00 A.M. in Courtroom 4. (Kastilahn, A)
April 8, 2010 555 Featured Case ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/8/2010 GRANTING 551 Motion to File documents under Seal and to file public versions supporting defendants' reply on Motion for Summary Judgment on Pike. (Matson, R)
April 28, 2010 564 Featured Case ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/28/2010 ORDERING 478 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED and 499 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED.(Matson, R)
April 28, 2010 565 Featured Case ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/28/2010 ORDERING that parties may file objections to this courts proposed sealing order within fourteen (14) days of the issuance of this order. Parties may file responses to the other partys objections within seven (7) days of their receipt of the objections.(Matson, R)
June 2, 2010 571 Featured Case ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/2/2010 ORDERING 565 the parties shall re-file their tentatively sealed documents; With each CD, the parties shall enclose a letter listing all the documents on each CD. This list shall include a short title for the document, the file name for the document, as saved on the CD, and the date upon which the document was initially filed. The CDs and the letters shall also include the case number and party name. Please direct any questions concerning the filing of the sealed documents to Ana Rivas, Courtroom Deputy; the parties shall file the sealed documents as described above within 7 days of the issuance of this order. (Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Natl Assn of Optomet, et al v. Lockyer, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]