In re: Mark and Tammy Sirmans

Appellant: Western Wood Fabricators
Debtor: Mark Sirmans and Tammy Sirmans
Trustee: Prem N Dhawan and U.S. Trustee
 
Case Number: 2:2008cv02223
Filed: September 18, 2008
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Bankruptcy Appeal (801) Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 11:101 Bankruptcy

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2009 10 Featured Case ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 01/05/2009 GRANTING 7 Petition to Extend Deadline For Filing and Serving Opening Brief on Appeal. Appellant is ORDERED to file and serve its opening brief and record on this appeal no later than Friday, January 30, 2009. (Streeter, J)
February 9, 2009 14 Featured Case ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/6/09 re 13 ORDERING that the deadline for appellant to file and serve its Opening Brief and the Record on this appeal is extended to and including Friday, February 20, 2009. (Duong, D)
April 3, 2009 35 Featured Case ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 04/03/09 ORDERING that Western Wood Fabricators' 31 Petition for an Extention is GRANTED; the deadline for appellant to file its Reply Brief on this Appeal is EXTENDED to 03/31/09. (Benson, A.)
April 6, 2009 36 Featured Case ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/3/09 ORDERING that Bankruptcy Appeal Hearing is SET for 5/18/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4. (Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: In re: Mark and Tammy Sirmans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Western Wood Fabricators
Represented By: James L. Pagano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Mark Sirmans
Represented By: W Scott de Bie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Tammy Sirmans
Represented By: W Scott de Bie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Prem N Dhawan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]