Vogelsang v. Zine et al

Plaintiff: Scott M. Vogelsang
Defendant: Laura Zine, Vicki Bennett, Jeffrey Dubsick, Jerry Lynn Hurst, Becky Larsen, Vivian Auble, Jean Stone, Cigna-Medicare, Electronic Data Systems LLC, CA Dept of Healthcare Services, Traci Waldheim, California Department of Justice and US Dept of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 2:2009cv02885
Filed: October 16, 2009
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: El Dorado
Referring Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/26/2010 ORDERING the January 28, 2010 hearing on the motions to dismiss, filed December 7, 23,29, and 30, 2009, (dkt. #s 23, 25, 28, 29, and 31), is vacated; and the motions are submitted on the record.(Matson, R)
October 23, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/22/2009 ORDERING that the pltf shall submit the appropriate filing fee within 20 days. (Suttles, J)
April 12, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/12/10 ORDERING that the hearing on defendant's motion to dismiss is continued to 5/13/10; Defendant is directed to forthwith file with this court the proof of servic e upon plaintiff of her pending motion to dismiss. If defendant failed to serve plaintiff with the motion to dismiss, defendant must so notify the court, and in which case defendant may renotice the motion and shall properly serve it as required by t he Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and applicable Local Rules; Plaintiff shall show cause, in writing, no later than 4/29/10, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to timely file an opposition or a statement of nonopposition to the pending motion; Plaintiff shall file an opposition to the motion, or a statement of non-opposition thereto, no later than 5/5/10; Failure of plaintiff to file an opposition will be deemed a statement of nonopposition to the pending motion, and may result in an adverse ruling, including but not limited to a recommendation that this action be dismissed for lack of prosecution; and Defendant may file a reply to plaintiff's opposition, if any, on or before 5/6/10. (Becknal, R)
April 30, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/29/2010 DENYING Vicki Bennett's 40 Motion to Proceed IFP, without prejudice, since defendant is currently under no obligation to prepay any filing fees. (Marciel, M)
July 12, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/9/2010 recommending that this action be dismissed and Clerk be directed to close this case. Parties may file objections to these findings and recommendations 14 days after being served.(Waggoner, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vogelsang v. Zine et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott M. Vogelsang
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Zine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Bennett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Dubsick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Lynn Hurst
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian Auble
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Stone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna-Medicare
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Data Systems LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CA Dept of Healthcare Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traci Waldheim
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Justice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Dept of Health and Human Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]