Boeing Company v. Movassaghi

Plaintiff: Boeing Company
Defendant: Maziar Movassaghi
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv03165
Filed: November 13, 2009
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Referring Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 3/5/10 ORDERING that Plaintiff will file its reply in support of summary judgment on or before 5/7/10; and the motion for summary judgment will be rescheduled for hearing on 5/17/10, subject to the Court's availability. (Becknal, R)
May 25, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 5/25/10: Each party shall file a brief responding to this order no later than June 7, 2010. Any reply shall be filed no later than June 14, 2010. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/21/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. The hearing on Plaintiff's summary judgment motion, currently scheduled for June 21, 2010, will be rescheduled following this hearing. (Kaminski, H)
June 21, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 6/18/10, ORDERING this action TRANSFERRED to the USDC for the Central District CA. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Boeing Company v. Movassaghi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boeing Company
Represented By: Mark Donnell Flanagan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maziar Movassaghi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]