Sheikh v. Medical Board of California et al

Plaintiff: Farzana Sheikh
Defendant: Medical Board of California and State of California
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv00213
Filed: January 27, 2010
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Referring Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 21, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/19/2010 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court is directed to return the letter sent to the court by Rehan Sheikh, dated 4/9/2010. (Reader, L) (Letter Sent USPS on 4/21/2010) (Reader, L).
April 28, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 4/28/2010 DENYING plaintiff's 27 Motion for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Hollows' 22 Order restricting e-filing access for Farzana Sheikh. (Marciel, M) Modified on 4/28/2010 (Marciel, M).
June 24, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/24/2010. Plaintiff's 50 Request for Recusal of Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 USC 455 is DENIED. (Marciel, M)
July 14, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/13/2010. Plaintiff's 33 Motion to Compel is VACATED from calendar pending Court's ruling on defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's 31 Motion to Compel is DENIED as M OOTED by 33 Motion. Defendants' 37 Request for Judicial Notice is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 42 Request for Briefing Schedule is VACATED from calendar. Court FINDS and RECOMMENDS that defendants' 40 Amended 18 Motion to Dismiss be granted and action be dismissed. Within 14 days after being served with these F/Rs, any party may file written Objections with Court and serve a copy on all parties. (Marciel, M)
February 4, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/3/2010 re 3 ORDERING that If plaintiff's husband is an attorney licensed by the State of California, he shall submit his bar number via a pleading no later than February 12, 2010, and sh all attest to his membership in the Bar of this court. If he is a licensed lawyer, he must sign up for and use CM/ECF (electronic filing). If no pleading is filed by February 12, 2010 as described in paragraph 1, the the complaint is stricken. If pl aintiff is representing herself, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, signed by plaintiff, within 14 days of this order. If no pleading is filed by February 12, 2010 as described in paragraph 1, the request for electronic filing is denied without prejudice, subject to a proper motion signed by plaintiff, demonstrating good cause.(Duong, D)
September 22, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/21/10 ORDERING that pltf's e-filing access is terminated. Clerk directed to terminate such access in this case. (Owen, K)
October 20, 2010 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 78 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 10/20/2010. (Matson, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sheikh v. Medical Board of California et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farzana Sheikh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Board of California
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]