United States of America v. .41 Acres of Land, More or Less, In the County of Sutter et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: .41 Acres of Land, More or Less, In the County of Sutter, Elizabeth Gianella, Sean Carberry, Sacramento and San Joaquin Drainage District and Steven Harrah, Sutter County Treasurer/Tax Collector
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv00791
Filed: April 2, 2010
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
 
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 43:945a Complaint in Condemnation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 16, 2010 10 Featured Case ORDER for PUBLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/14/10. (Carlos, K)
May 28, 2010 22 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER 17 , signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/27/10, ORDERING that dft Sacramento and San Joaquin Drainage District is DISMISSED from this action.(Kastilahn, A)
May 28, 2010 23 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER 22 , signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/27/10, ORDERING that dft Steven Harrah, Treasurer-Tax Assessor, County of Sutter, State of CA, is DISMISSED from this action. (Kastilahn, A)
June 7, 2010 27 Featured Case ORDER for DELIVERY of POSSESSION signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/7/10 ORDERING that all defendants in this action, and all persons in possession or control of the property, shall immediately surrender possession of said property to plaintiff upon service of a copy of this orer. It is further ORDERED that plaintiff shall provide defendant with 72 hours notice before the commencement of construction on her property. (Donati, J)
June 6, 2011 47 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/4/11 ORDERING joint statement for hearing on 46 MOTION to COMPEL Attendance at Deposition with Production of Documents due 6/16/2011. (Meuleman, A)
June 14, 2011 50 Featured Case FINAL JUDGMENT IN EMINENT DOMAIN signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 06/14/11 ORDERING that that judgment is hereby entered against the USA in the amount of $15,000.00; that title to the interests condemned in this action vested in the US A free and discharged of all claims and liens of any kind whatsoever on 04/02/10, which is the date on which the Declaration of Taking was filed, and the $3,140.00 estimated just compensation was deposited into the Court's registry; the US shall deposit the deficiency of $11,860.00 into the Court's registry; the Clerk shall distribute $15,000.00 by check made payable to "Elizabeth Gianella" and mailed to: Thomas Gianella; this payment shall be full, adequate an d just compensation for the taking of the estate and interests in the subject property. The Clerk is directed to enter satisfaction of this judgment of record upon the payment to defendant; the ninety percent of any interest earned on the estimated j ust compensation of $3,140.00 shall be paid to the U.S. by check made payable to "Western Area Power Administration" and delivered to the Office of the U.S. Attorney for this District, in care of the Civil Division Chief. The Court shall retain the remaining 10 percent of any interest earned on the estimated just compensation for the Court's registry fee. The parties shall be responsible for their own legal fees, costs, and expenses (cc: Financial). CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. .41 Acres of Land, More or Less, In the County of Sutter et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kelli L. Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: .41 Acres of Land, More or Less, In the County of Sutter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Gianella
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Carberry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento and San Joaquin Drainage District
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Harrah, Sutter County Treasurer/Tax Collector
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]