In Defense of Animals et al v. United States Department of the Interior et al

Plaintiff: In Defense of Animals, Dreamcatcher Wild Horse and Burro Sanctuary, Barbara Clarke, Chad Hanson and Linda Hay
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior, Bureau of Land Management, Ken Salazar, Robert Abbey and Dayne Barron
Case Number: 2:2010cv01852
Filed: July 15, 2010
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2011 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REVISING SCHEDULE signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/08/11 ORDERING that the Court's 99 Pretrial Scheduling Order is MODIFIED as follows: Plaintiffs' Response/Reply Brief (not to exceed 60 pages): 01/12/12; Federal Defen dants' Intervenors' Reply Briefs (not to exceed 25 pages): 01/26/12; Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply Brief (not to exceed 20 pages): 02/05/12. All other deadlines shall be maintained as previously ordered. The hearing shall be held on 02/23/12 at 2:00 p.m. (Benson, A.)
December 8, 2011 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REVISING BRIEFING SCHEDULE signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/8/2011 GRANTING 108 Motion for Extension of Time. Fed. Defendants' Cross-Motion/Opposition due 12/9/2011; Plaintiffs' Response/Reply Brief due 1/13/2012. All other deadlines and all page limits shall be maintained as previously ordered. The hearing shall be held on 2/23/2012, at 2:00 p.m. (Michel, G)
November 15, 2012 121 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDU and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/15/12; DENYING 104 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 109 and 111 Cross Motions for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment accordingly and to close this file. (Meuleman, A)
July 29, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/28/2010 ORDERING 36 that Safari Club International and Safari Club International Foundation are GRANTED amici curiae status. IT IS FURTHERED ORDERED, that the amici curiae brief filed as an exhibit to their memorandum of points and authorities in support of the motion is DEEMED filed as of the date of this order. Safari Club International shall take any necessary steps to ensure proper filing of this brief under the Local Rules. (Reader, L)
August 3, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 8/2/10, ORDERING that pltfs are GRANTED nunc pro tunc leave to file a 41 page memorandum of points and authorities in support of pltfs' motion for TRO and prelim injunction on July 22, 2010. (Kastilahn, A)
August 9, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 08/09/10 ORDERING that plfs' 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. (Benson, A.)
August 9, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court [DISREGARD- DUPLICATE of 53 Order] ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/9/2010 DENYING 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Donati, J) Modified on 8/9/2010 (Donati, J).
December 15, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/15/10. Motion to Dismiss 68 Hearing, re-set for 3/24/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Williams, D)
February 1, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/29/11 ORDERING that the hearing on the Motion to Intervene is taken off calendar. The motion will be decided on the papers. Opposition to motion due by 2/10/11; reply to opposition due by 2/17/11. (Manzer, C)
March 3, 2011 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 77 Motion to Stay signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/3/11: The hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 68 remains set for hearing on March 24, 2011 as currently calendared. (Kaminski, H)
March 21, 2011 88 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/21/2011 GRANTING 72 Motion to Intervene by Safari Club. (Zignago, K.)
July 20, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/20/10 ORDERING that the Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restrining Order and Preliminary Injunction is as follows: Plaintiff's Motion filed by 7/22/10, Defendant's opposition due by 7/27/10, Plaintiff's Reply due by 7/30/10 and hearing set for 8/5/2010 at 02:00 PM. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 20, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/19/2011 ORDERING that Defendant's 68 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint is DENIED as to all ten counts. (Duong, D)
September 29, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/28/11 GRANTING parties' modification of the page limitations. The filing deadlines are as follows: Plaintiffs' opening brief due by 11/10/2011, Federal Defendants' and Intervenors' ; cross-motion/response briefs due by 12/8/2011, Plaintiffs' response/reply brief due by 1/5/2012, Federal Defendants' and Intervenors' reply briefs due by 1/19/2012 and Plaintiffs' sur-reply brief due by 1/26/12. Hearing set for 2/23/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Donati, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Defense of Animals et al v. United States Department of the Interior et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: In Defense of Animals
Represented By: Stuart G. Gross
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dreamcatcher Wild Horse and Burro Sanctuary
Represented By: Stuart G. Gross
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Clarke
Represented By: Stuart G. Gross
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Hanson
Represented By: Stuart G. Gross
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Hay
Represented By: Stuart G. Gross
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Salazar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Abbey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayne Barron
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]